Padilla et al v. Willner et al

Plaintiff: Claudia Padilla and Lesli Guido
Defendant: Vera Willner and Manpower, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04866
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
January 13, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Lesli Guido, Claudia Padilla. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
November 5, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 11-cv-2846-JST. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/05/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
October 27, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/27/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla et al v. Willner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Padilla
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Represented By: Patrick Darryn Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesli Guido
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Represented By: Patrick Darryn Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Willner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?