Estell v. McHugh

Plaintiff: Quo Vat Estell
Defendant: John McHugh
Case Number: 3:2015cv04898
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
November 21, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2016. Response due 1/12/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 30 Stipulation; granting 32 Stipulation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
August 4, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 11, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JULY 14, 2016 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/11/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 14, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/14/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 6, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CHAMBERS COPIES re 18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/6/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 3, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation re Amended Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
January 20, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/20/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estell v. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quo Vat Estell
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?