Yates v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Peter Yates
Defendant: David B. Adams, Nexstar Broadcasting Group, Inc., Seal Rock Broadcasters, LLC, Sarkes Tarzian, Inc., Gray Television, Inc., Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc., Intermountain West Communications Company, Inc. and Comcast Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv04912
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge James Donato granting 76 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2017)
March 1, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. James Donato granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
May 4, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court asks the plaintiff's counsel to weigh in on the request. The ruling is deferred; Re 57 Letter filed by Comcast Corporation, Seal Rock Broadcasters, LLC, David B. Adams, Nexstar Broadcasting Group, Inc., Gray Television, Inc., Intermountain West Communications Company, Inc., Sarkes Tarzian, Inc., Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/4/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Yates
Represented By: Charles R. Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Adams
Represented By: Jessica Stuart Pliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexstar Broadcasting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Stuart Pliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seal Rock Broadcasters, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Stuart Pliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarkes Tarzian, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Stuart Pliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Television, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Stuart Pliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermountain West Communications Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?