Hudson v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Sharlet Hudson
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv04921
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 23 Stipulation; granting 24 Stipulation to Plaintiff's Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
July 15, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; Remanding Case for Further Proceedings.. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
April 7, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Stipulation Extending deadline.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
December 3, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/3/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharlet Hudson
Represented By: Kyle R. Kitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Patrick William Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?