Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc. et al v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc. and Confidence Pregnancy Center Inc.
Defendant: Kamala Harris, Karen Smith, Michael Colantuono, Alison Barrat-Green, Cindy Day-Wilson, Jeffrey S. Blanck, Christopher A. Callihan and Charles J. McKee
Case Number: 3:2015cv04939
Filed: October 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR re 84 Order to Show Cause. (Correction of date Sanctions are due.) Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/28/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 25, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 18, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 18, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
January 7, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 68 STIPULATION to Continue the Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 16, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING on 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 7, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 7, 2015. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 2, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATION to Modify Deadline to File Opposition ; ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Responses due by noon 12/2/2015. Replies due by noon 12/7/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/2/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 1, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 1, 2015. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 17, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/17/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc. et al v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Francis James Manion
Represented By: Geoffrey Richard Surtees
Represented By: Robert Henry Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pregnancy Care Center of the North Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Francis James Manion
Represented By: Geoffrey Richard Surtees
Represented By: Robert Henry Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confidence Pregnancy Center Inc.
Represented By: Francis James Manion
Represented By: Geoffrey Richard Surtees
Represented By: Robert Henry Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Noreen Patricia Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Smith
Represented By: Noreen Patricia Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Colantuono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Barrat-Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Day-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Blanck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Callihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?