Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Centex Homes

Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Centex Homes and Centex Real Estate Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv04951
Filed: October 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 4, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Selecting Private ADR by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 4, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Resetting deadlines for defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs complaint. Reset Deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Responses due by 12/30/2015. Replies due by 1/6/2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 4, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Centex Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond Earl Brown
Represented By: Jason Yuen Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Thomas Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Thomas Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?