Liu v. UC Berkeley/UC Regents

Plaintiff: Amy Liu
Defendant: UC Berkeley/UC Regents
Case Number: 3:2015cv04958
Filed: October 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 01/31/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
November 22, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Motion for Summary Judgment re: 46 Stipulation filed by Amy Liu (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
April 28, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 30 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Granting Leave to Further Amend Complaint; Vacating Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/28/2016. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 21 Motion to Disqualify Judge (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
December 30, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Order Reassigning Case. Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/30/15. Certificate of Service attached. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. UC Berkeley/UC Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UC Berkeley/UC Regents
Represented By: Michal Grzegorz Kubicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?