Buffin et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Riana Buffin and Crystal Patterson
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and State of California
Case Number: 3:2015cv04959
Filed: October 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2017 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 110 Motion to Intervene. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
October 14, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting in part 76 Motion to Dismiss; granting with leave to amend 77 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 81 Motion to Intervene. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
August 11, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSIONS; CONTINUING HEARING re 77 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Kamala Harris, 81 Second MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by California Bail Agents Association, 76 MOTION to Dismiss THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Vicki Hennessy, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/11/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
May 6, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 63 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 69 Motion for Leave to File surreply. The hearing set for May 10, 2016 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
February 1, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as premature 41 Motion to Intervene; denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss; granting 26 Motion for More Definite Statement ; denying without prejudice 2 Motion for preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint no later than 2/25/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 5, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re [45-2] MOTION Allow Pro Hac Vice Admission as to Alexander Karakatsanis representing Plaintiffs filed by Riana Buffin, Crystal Patterson. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/5/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 18, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; CONTINUING HEARING re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of California, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss, 26 Joinder in Motion to Dismiss; MOTION for More Definite Statement. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2016 is CONTINUED to 1/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 1, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Reply Brief (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 4, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE.Set/Reset Deadlines as to 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction;Responses due 11/23/15; Replies Due 12/2/15 by NOON. Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for WEDNESDAY, 12/16/15 at 09:30 AM in Cou rtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 7 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 11/13/2015. Replies due by 11/20/2015. Motion to Certify Class Hearing set for WEDNESDAY, 12/16/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is 11/23/15. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/4/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 30, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Teleconference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buffin et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riana Buffin
Represented By: Katherine Claire Hubbard
Represented By: Phil Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Patterson
Represented By: Katherine Claire Hubbard
Represented By: Phil Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Jose Alfonso Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?