Beltran v. Terraform Global, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Juan M. Rodriguez Beltran
Defendant: Terraform Global, Inc., SunEdison, Inc., Ahmad Chatila, Carlos Domenech Zornoza, Jeremy Avenier, Martin Truong, Brian Wuebbels, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., BTG Pactual US Capital, LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc., SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC and Kotak Mahindra, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv04981
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2016 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by MDL Panel on 10/4/16. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
July 14, 2016 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 90 in 5:15-cv-05068-BLF, 139 in 5:15-cv-04981-BLF). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/14/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 2, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING PYRAMID HOLDINGS, INC. AS INTERIM LEAD PLAINTIFF; AND APPOINTING ABRAHAM, FRUCHTER & TWERSKY, LLP AS INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL. Motions terminated: (28 in 5:15-cv-04981-BLF) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc., (6 in 5:15-cv-05068-BLF) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Pyramid Holdings, Inc. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 17, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATEMENT RE IMPACT OF RELATED CASE ORDER UPON PENDING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL. Statement due by 5/24/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/17/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 28, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/28/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 11, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PYRAMID'S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY; AND SUBMITTING MOTIONS TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL (addressing 26 , 28 , 71 in case 5:15-cv-04981-BLF; addressing 6 in case 5:15-cv-05068-BLF). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/11/2016.(blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 3, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 11, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaints by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 47 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran v. Terraform Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan M. Rodriguez Beltran
Represented By: Joseph Vincent Halloran
Represented By: John Jasnoch
Represented By: Thomas L Laughlin, IV
Represented By: Thomas L. Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terraform Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunEdison, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Chatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Domenech Zornoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Avenier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wuebbels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTG Pactual US Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itau BBA USA Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kotak Mahindra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?