De Ceoursty et al v. General Dynamics Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jenna De Ceoursty and Kevin De Ceoursty
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation, Dana Companies LLC, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Associated Insulation of California, Walashek Industrial & Marine Inc, Robert E. Blake, Inc and Gail De Ceoursty
Case Number: 3:2015cv04984
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company filed by Jenna De Ceoursty, Kevin De Ceoursty. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 12, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC., filed by Jenna De Ceoursty, Kevin De Ceoursty. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
July 29, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC formerly known as DANA CORPORATION filed by Jenna De Ceoursty, Kevin De Ceoursty. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
May 19, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED fka NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIPBUILDING, INC. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on May 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
April 25, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA filed by Jenna De Ceoursty, Kevin De Ceoursty. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
February 10, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/10/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 5, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT OREILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (FKA CSK AUTO, INC.) filed by Jenna De Ceoursty, Kevin De Ceoursty. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/5/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 22, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT WALASHEK INDUSTRIAL & MARINE, INC. filed by Jenna De Ceoursty, Kevin De Ceoursty. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
November 2, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/2/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Ceoursty et al v. General Dynamics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna De Ceoursty
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin De Ceoursty
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Paul M. Bessette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Randall K. Bernard
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Peggy S. Doyle
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Mari Kiridjian
Represented By: Edward Richard Ulloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Insulation of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walashek Industrial & Marine Inc
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Blake, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail De Ceoursty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?