Coyote Valley Band of Pomo Indians of California, et al v. United States Department of Transportation et al

Plaintiff: Round Valley Indian Tribes of California and Coyote Valley Band of Pomo Indians
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation, Anthony Foxx, Federal Highway Administration, Gregory Nadeau, California Department of Transportation and Malcolm Dougherty
Case Number: 3:2015cv04987
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, 68 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 10, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
January 23, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART 69 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by California Department of Transportation and CONTINUING Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2017. Motion to Amend due by 2/17/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 23, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
July 11, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Deferring Ruling on 54 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 11, 2016. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 20, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 52 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINES; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016) Modified on 6/20/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Case Schedule for Further Settlement Discussions. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2016. Motions due by 6/6/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
March 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 4/22/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
December 17, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/17/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyote Valley Band of Pomo Indians of California, et al v. United States Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Foxx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Transportation
Represented By: Derek Scott van Hoften
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Dougherty
Represented By: Derek Scott van Hoften
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Round Valley Indian Tribes of California
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Sharon Eileen Duggan
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coyote Valley Band of Pomo Indians
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Sharon Eileen Duggan
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?