Homampour v. Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Aram Homampour
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv05003
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/26/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
March 10, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
February 9, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (1) FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND (2) CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2017. Case Management Conference reset for 3/14/2017 02:00 P M in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing reset for 5/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
December 22, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Portions of Third Amended Complaint by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 49 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
October 26, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule on 49 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 11/14/2016. Reply due by 12/5/2016.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/26/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
August 31, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are given leave to amend within 20 days of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
May 27, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 STIPULATION to Continue The June 14, 2016 Initial Case Management Conference and Set Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion To Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2016. Case Management Conference continued to 8/10/2016 02: 00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Response due by 7/13/2016. Reply due by 7/27/2016. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 8/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/27/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
April 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, RESPONSE THERETO, AND CONTINUATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 24 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
January 25, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 STIPULATION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2016. Case Management Conference Continued to 5/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/26/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 4, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 3/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/04/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homampour v. Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aram Homampour
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Timothy J. Rozelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?