Bernard Mitchell v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al

Plaintiff: Bernard Mitchell
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Does
Case Number: 3:2015cv05006
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE MOTIONS; DENYING MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/22/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 12, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 11 Motion to Dismiss, 31 Motion for Sanctions, and 64 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 12, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
November 13, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (JSW) immediately after the case number. Any case management conference in any reassigned case will be rescheduled by the Court. Unless otherwise ordered, any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be re-noticed by the moving party before the newly assigned judge. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/13/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernard Mitchell v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Mitchell
Represented By: Raye Mitchell
Represented By: Sandra Raye Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Edward R Buell, III
Represented By: Joseph Guzzetta
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Represented By: John B Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?