Automated Media Processing Solutions, Inc., dba Equilibrium

Plaintiff: Automated Media Processing Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Schawk Digital Solutions, Inc. and Blue Software, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05018
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting stipulation to extend to respond to initial complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/22/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 11, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 17 Ex Parte Application MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Schawk Digital Solutions, Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/11/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 19, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 11 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Scheduling Order filed by Automated Media Processing Solutions, Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/19/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 3, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automated Media Processing Solutions, Inc., dba Equilibrium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automated Media Processing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Timothy Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schawk Digital Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Software, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?