Ziani v. Earthlink Shared Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mariam (Mimi) Ziani
Defendant: Earthlink Shared Services, LLC and Earthlink, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05052
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATED DISMISSAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
March 21, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
February 4, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 27, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AMENDED COMPLAINT, Motions terminated: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of the Amended Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Earthlink, Inc... Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/27/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 19, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 8, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/8/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziani v. Earthlink Shared Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam (Mimi) Ziani
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthlink Shared Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthlink, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?