Tech 21 UK Limited et al v. Spigen Inc.

Plaintiff: Tech 21 UK Limited and Tech 21 Licensing Limited
Defendant: Spigen Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05059
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/8/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/10/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
June 9, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/2/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Flo or, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
February 2, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING SPIGEN, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/2/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tech 21 UK Limited et al v. Spigen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech 21 UK Limited
Represented By: David B. Owsley, II
Represented By: Melissa Smith
Represented By: Mari-Elise Taube
Represented By: Vijay K. Toke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech 21 Licensing Limited
Represented By: David B. Owsley, II
Represented By: Melissa Smith
Represented By: Mari-Elise Taube
Represented By: Vijay K. Toke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spigen Inc.
Represented By: Heedong Chae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?