Securities & Exchange Commission v. Craig

Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: James Alan Craig
Case Number: 3:2015cv05076
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND APPOINTING PRO BONO COUNSEL by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
August 21, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Breyer denying 21 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying 22 Motion for Stay. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
July 27, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2018.. Signed by Judge Breyer on 7/27/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Alan Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Steven Dennis Buchholz
Represented By: Elena Ro
Represented By: Joseph G. Sansone
Represented By: John Scott Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?