Scott Johnson v. SSR Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: SSR Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05094
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/13/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
July 11, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Staying Action Pending Mediation Pursuant to General Order No. 56. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 21, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 Proposed Order filed by SSR Group, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/21/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
March 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/8/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
January 25, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, DKT. NO. 16 . The parties are ORDERED to complete the joint inspection and meet and confer process pursuant to General Order 56. All briefing on Defendant's Motion is STAYED and the 2/25/2016 hearing is VACATED. Parties to file joint status report. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/25/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
November 30, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing Diablo Auto Management, Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/30/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Johnson v. SSR Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark Dee Potter
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSR Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sunita Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?