Lippincott v. DIRECTV, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Gary Lippincott, Jr.
Defendant: DIRECTV, Inc. and DIRECTV Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05096
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 14, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 18, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 12, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV Holdings LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/12/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lippincott v. DIRECTV, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, Inc.
Represented By: Robyn Eileen Bladow
Represented By: Melissa D. Ingalls
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robyn Eileen Bladow
Represented By: Melissa D. Ingalls
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gary Lippincott, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Christopher Buhrow
Represented By: Brian Gudmundson
Represented By: Jason R. Lee
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: Arthur M Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?