Cook v. County of Contra Costa
Plaintiff: David Cook
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Case Number: 3:2015cv05099
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Amended complaint due by 08/01/17. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/30/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017) Modified on 6/30/2017 (tehlc1, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 49 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/16/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting 33 Motion to Dismiss as to Defendant County of Contra Costa. Plaintiff shall serve the Third Amended Complaint on the remaining individual defendants forthwith. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss SAC. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 03/10/16. Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint no later than 03/31/16. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file amended complaint no later than 01/08/16. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/10/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. County of Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cook
Represented By: David Elias Castro
Represented By: John Christopher Maples
Represented By: Mark Stawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: Nima Eghbali Sohi, N/A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?