Hills v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Penny Slinger Hills
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc, National Default Servicing Corporation and Citi Mortgage, Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv05108
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 13 19 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 2, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Citi Mortgage, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. CMC reset for 4/21/16 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/2/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 15, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 Stipulation filed by Penny Slinger Hills. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hills v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Slinger Hills
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Mortgage, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?