Tan v. Grubhub, Inc.

Plaintiff: Andrew Tan
Defendant: Grubhub, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05128
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 125 Motion for Sanctions. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 18, 2017 172 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 171 Discovery Letter Brief.(jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
July 10, 2017 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
May 3, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE 88 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/3/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
September 16, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1.Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 6/5/2017 at 08:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Fra ncisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2017 to 6/16/2017 at 08:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/16/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
July 13, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 50 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
May 6, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/5/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
March 22, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 21 Motion to Dismiss.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
February 10, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Stipulation re: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, STAY ALL PAGA CLAIMS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, filed by Andrew Tan, Raef Lawson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/10/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tan v. Grubhub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Tan
Represented By: Matthew David Carlson
Represented By: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grubhub, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Tyler Goodwin
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Dhananjay Saikrishna Manthripragada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?