McDaniel
Plaintiff: Lashaunda M. McDaniel
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05140
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REQUESTIG STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 15 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT:Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/5/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashaunda M. McDaniel
Represented By: Cari Ann Cohorn
Represented By: David Matt Levin
Represented By: Annie W Munene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Hanna Betty Raanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?