Roche v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Deborah Roche
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05147
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2015 6 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 12, 2015 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 10, 2015 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 11/24/2015. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deborah Roche re 1 Complaint (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 2 Proposed Summons. (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Facebook, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-9979931). Filed by Deborah Roche. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/12/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roche v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Roche
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?