Netcott v. Nexius Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Donovan Netcott
Defendant: Nexius Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05172
Filed: November 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
February 12, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/12/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
January 22, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 8, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPY OF ANSWER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 8, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netcott v. Nexius Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexius Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: James Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Donovan Netcott
Represented By: Gaurav Bobby Kalra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?