Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations et al v. Carlson et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations and North Coast Rivers Alliance
Defendant: Ann Carlson, United States Forest Service and Thomas James Vilsack
Case Number: 3:2015cv05177
Filed: November 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL. Attorney David Bernard Glazer terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 31, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 31, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 23, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court having been advised that the parties anticipate the above-titled action will be voluntarily dismissed within the next 60 days, the Status Conference currently scheduled for September 9, 2016, is continued to November 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
June 1, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON CROSS-MOTIONS; SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The briefing schedule previously set on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment is vacated, and a Status Conference is scheduled for September 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 1, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
April 25, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING FILING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON COMPUTER DISK OR DRIVE. With respect to courtesy copies for Chambers, the Stipulation is approved, on condition that a paper copy of any document cited in a party's briefing be provided by that party, absent an order from the Court allowing such party to provide an excerpted paper copy in lieu thereof. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
January 28, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER. The Case Management Conference presently scheduled for February 12, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. is continued to February 19, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations et al v. Carlson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Daniel Garrett-Steinman
Represented By: Alexis Elizabeth Krieg
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Coast Rivers Alliance
Represented By: Daniel Garrett-Steinman
Represented By: Alexis Elizabeth Krieg
Represented By: Stephan Coles Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Carlson
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas James Vilsack
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?