Aquino et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Perfecto B. Aquino, Jr. and Zenaida Aquino
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05181
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 3, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/3/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
January 27, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 15, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
November 30, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aquino et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfecto B. Aquino, Jr.
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenaida Aquino
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?