Colony Insurance Company v. Fowler et al

Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Defendant: David Fowler and Daniel Gatley
Case Number: 3:2015cv05184
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 42 Stipulation filed by Colony Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
May 31, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting status. Status Report due by 7/28/2016. Status Conference reset from 6/9/2016 to 8/4/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 11, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Mark Davis Insurance Agency, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Insurance Company v. Fowler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Charlston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gatley
Represented By: Delphine S. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?