McDaniel v. Hilton Concord et al

Plaintiff: Gary McDaniel
Defendant: Hilton Concord and Interstate Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05196
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/30/2016. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
January 15, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing re pending EEOC investigation and need for further stay of this action is set for Friday, 4/15/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
November 18, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CITIZENSHIP OF LLC MEMBERS. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 12/11/2015 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by Friday, 12/4/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/18/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Hilton Concord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary McDaniel
Represented By: Donna Echiverri-Beckham
Represented By: Gordon M. Fauth, Jr.
Represented By: Katryn Hope Echiverri Ranoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Concord
Represented By: Adam J. Fiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Fiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?