Crawford v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles M. Crawford
Defendant: Richard Frieden, M.D., Sutter Santa Rosa Regional Hospital, West Virginia University Medical Center, Sutter Health, St. Joseph Health, Gauri Pawar, M.D., The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., University Health Associates, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, Southwest Community Health Center and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05198
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles M. Crawford (Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 13 Minute Entry for case management conference held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on on 2/16/2016. A further case management conference is set for 4/19/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. An updated case management statement is due by 4/12/2016. FTR Time 10:24 - 10:30 Plaintiff Attorney: Douglas Fladseth Defendant Attorney: Not Present This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Charles M. Crawford. (Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 2/9/2016) Modified on 2/10/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2015 Filing 10 Refund re #8 Application for Refund approved. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 9 Refund re #6 Application for Refund denied. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 8 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-9989116 by Charles M. Crawford. (Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charles M. Crawford.. (Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 6 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 250CATEU by Charles M. Crawford. (Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Richard Frieden, M.D., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Gauri Pawar, M.D., Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, Southwest Community Health Center, St. Joseph Health, Sutter Health, Sutter Santa Rosa Regional Hospital, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., University Health Associates, West Virginia University Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Summons - part 2)(mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 13, 2015 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2016 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 11/27/2015. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 12, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9989116.). Filed byCharles M Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fladseth, Douglas) (Filed on 11/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Frieden, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Santa Rosa Regional Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gauri Pawar, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Health Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Community Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M. Crawford
Represented By: Douglas Curwood Fladseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?