Vogt v. California Highway Patrol et al

Plaintiff: Leah Vogt
Defendant: California Highway Patrol, Joseph Farrow, Sean Harrington, Robert Hazelwood and Dion Simmons
Case Number: 3:2015cv05199
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 9, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Docket No. 21 Granting Request to Vacate CMC Status. Status Report due by 9/23/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/9/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
April 12, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Stipulated Request to Continue CMC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
January 15, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRALFOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 15, 2016. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogt v. California Highway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Vogt
Represented By: Richard Allen Madsen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dion Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?