Pradeep et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited

Plaintiff: A.K. Pradeep, Ratnakar Dev, Thomas Robbins and Moodcast, Inc.
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited
Case Number: 3:2015cv05229
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on May 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 11, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Hearing Date for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited. Motion Hearing sreet for 6/23/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 9, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Ratnakar Dev, Moodcast, Inc., A.K. Pradeep, Thomas Robbins filed by Moodcast, Inc., Thomas Robbins, Ratnakar Dev, A.K. Pradeep. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pradeep et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.K. Pradeep
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Represented By: Robert C. Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ratnakar Dev
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Represented By: Robert C. Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Robbins
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Represented By: Robert C. Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moodcast, Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Represented By: J.T. Wells Blaxter
Represented By: Robert C. Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited
Represented By: Ann K. Johnston
Represented By: Ted Aubrey Vincett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?