MacKinnon v. Logitech Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert MacKinnon
Defendant: Logitech Inc. and Lifesize, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05231
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER remanding case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/20/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 17, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying without prejudice 85 Motion to file document under seal. Defendants may, if they wish, file a revised, narrowly tailored request for sealing by 04/20/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 13, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part 61 Defendants' motion for summary judgment and denying in part 39 Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 12, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 39 61 Motions for summary judgment. Supplemental briefs due by 4/19/2017. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco, before the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/12/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
November 8, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson denying 60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Defendants shall file an unredacted copy of the exhibit or a narrowly tailored sealing request by 11/15/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 18, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting 50 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff to file redacted version of the Declaration of Matthew Wayne on or before 10/25/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
September 26, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 9/26/16.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 5, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/1/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
May 18, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 23 Defendants' motion to dismiss third amended complaint. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
February 11, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint due by 3/3/2016. Case Management Conference scheduled for 2/22/2016 is continued to 5/9/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/11/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacKinnon v. Logitech Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech Inc.
Represented By: Brady Richard Dewar
Represented By: Ivo Michael Labar
Represented By: Zachary Brian Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifesize, Inc.
Represented By: Brady Richard Dewar
Represented By: Ivo Michael Labar
Represented By: Zachary Brian Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert MacKinnon
Represented By: Kelly Armstrong
Represented By: Barbara Emily Cowin Figari
Represented By: Matthew P. Vandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?