Nguyen v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association

Plaintiff: Huy Nguyen
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2015cv05239
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 46 Motion to Certify Class. A Further Case Management Conference is set for November 3, 2017. The parties are instructed to meet and confer and submit a joint Case Management Conference Statement that includes a proposed schedule for the remainder of the case by October 27, 2017. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 26, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 26, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
February 17, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 13 Letter filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association for Paul Berkowitz to appear by phone on 2/19/16 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/17/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huy Nguyen
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Kirsten Eloise Bass
Represented By: Paul Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Roy Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?