Stevenson v. Jones
Plaintiff: Charles L. Stevenson
Defendant: M. Jones
Case Number: 3:2015cv05241
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER 48 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO AMEND OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT 39 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING REQUESTS FOR DISCOVERY AND COUNSEL 28 29 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER 16 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?