Rosamanda Flores v. The City of Concord, et al

Plaintiff: Rosamanda Flores
Defendant: The City of Concord
Case Number: 3:2015cv05244
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with Leave to Amend. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 14, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Reassigned Case. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 08/14/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
June 8, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 06/22/17. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/08/17.(tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
October 3, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/3/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
April 14, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/14/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
February 24, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and finding as moot 11 Report and Recommendation. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosamanda Flores v. The City of Concord, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosamanda Flores
Represented By: Stanley Craig Goff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Concord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?