Performance Contracting, Inc. v. Engineered Wall Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Performance Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Engineered Wall Systems, Inc.
3rd_party_defendant: Top Notch Collision, LLC
3rd_party_plaintiff: Engineered Wall Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05245
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floo r, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Jury Selection/Trial set for 7/10/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 1, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Denying as Moot 31 Third Party Defendant Top Notch Collision, LLC's Motion to Dismiss.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 12, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 20 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 5, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Third Party Defendant Top Notch Collision, LLC Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Performance Contracting, Inc. v. Engineered Wall Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Performance Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk Edward Giberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineered Wall Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Gaudreau
Represented By: Chad V. Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Top Notch Collision, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Engineered Wall Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Gaudreau
Represented By: Chad V. Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?