Cardinalli et al v. Wireless Lifestyle, Inc.

Plaintiff: Damon Cardinalli, Robert Crandall, Rene Fragoso, Daniel Guerrero, Nishell Johnson, Daisy Larios, Shannon Law, Pauline Martinez, Jeffrey Monroy, Seng Saephan, Michael Santos, Sarah Scott, Ernesto Segovia, Robert Ramirez and Nickolas Ross
Defendant: Wireless Lifestyle, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05268
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
April 1, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Motion to Relate Case (Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases) to 16-cv-1138-HSG.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 14, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinalli et al v. Wireless Lifestyle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Cardinalli
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Crandall
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Fragoso
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Guerrero
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nishell Johnson
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Larios
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Law
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Martinez
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Monroy
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seng Saephan
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Santos
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Scott
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Segovia
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ramirez
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickolas Ross
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wireless Lifestyle, Inc.
Represented By: Shaun Jordan Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?