Varnes v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mark Varnes
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv05269
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The court-appointed mediator having advised the Court by Certification, filed May 23, 2016, that the above-titled case has settled, the plaintiff's claims against defendant are dismissed without prejudice; provided, ho wever, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety (90) days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 13, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE (ADR LOCAL RULE 6-5); ORDER. The deadline to complete mediation is extended to May 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 2, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Plaintiff is permitted to file the proposed First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 2, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 11, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
January 5, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/5/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varnes v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Varnes
Represented By: Hillary Jo Benham-Baker
Represented By: Julia Campins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan S. Altura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?