Aquino v. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angelita Aquino
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05281
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Angelita Aquino. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 16 Motion to Compel. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by Angelita Aquino. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aquino v. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelita Aquino
Represented By: Diane Aqui
Represented By: Antonio Luis Cortes
Represented By: Glenn Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn M. Nazarian
Represented By: Clifford Douglas Sethness
Represented By: Jason Michael Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?