Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. CB Freight Int'l, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Defendant: CB Freight Int'l, Inc., Sky-World Int'l Express, Inc. and Universal Concord Co.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05289
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/18/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
August 30, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER 39 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/30/16. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 25, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SEVER DEFENDANT CB FREIGHT INT'L, INC. FROM THE ACTION filed by Sky-World Int'l Express, Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/25/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 12, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference; ORDER Requiring Appearing Parties to File a Stipulation. Stipulation regarding severance due by 8/24/2016. Further Case Management Conference continued to 12/13/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/12/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
April 8, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. filed by Sky-World Int'l Express, Inc., Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/8/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
February 26, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Sky-World Int'l Express, Inc., Attorney Paul B. Arenas for Sky-World Int'l Express, Inc. added. Attorney Marilyn Raia terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/26/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. CB Freight Int'l, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Conte C. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB Freight Int'l, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-World Int'l Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Concord Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?