Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. Doe-50.174.109.117

Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Defendant: Doe-50.174.109.117
Case Number: 3:2015cv05312
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/4/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
December 10, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/10/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 3, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 5 THE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO TAKE EARLY DISCOVERY. Good cause appearing, the court grants DBC's ex parte motion. The court directs DBC to file a proposed subpoena and a proposed order, see N.D. Cal. Civ. L.R. 7-2(c), for the court's approval by December 10, 2015. Once the court approves the subpoena, DBC may serve it on Comcast Cable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/3/2015.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. Doe-50.174.109.117
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Represented By: James Stephen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe-50.174.109.117
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?