Summa Resource Holdings LLC v. Carbon Energy Limited

Plaintiff: Summa Resource Holdings LLC
Defendant: Carbon Energy Limited
Case Number: 3:2015cv05334
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Judgment in this case is entered in favor of defendant Carbon Energy Limited. Plaintiff Summa Resource Holdings LLC shall recover nothing on its Complaint. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff asserting them in Queensland, Australia.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/16/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 5, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Action on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/05/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Supplemental Briefing in lieu of April 18, 2016 Hearing. Parties shall submit supplemental briefing addressing the questions in this Order by 4/22/16. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/18/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
February 16, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing; Continuing Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 02/16/16. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summa Resource Holdings LLC v. Carbon Energy Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summa Resource Holdings LLC
Represented By: Christine Marie Morgan
Represented By: John Stephen Siamas, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon Energy Limited
Represented By: Paul James Hall, Esq.
Represented By: David Allen Priebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?