Yu v. Design Learned, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Yu
Defendant: Design Learned, Inc., E.C.C. & Associates, Scott Learned, Kelly August, Michael Pfarr, Ann Block and Tim Levy
Case Number: 3:2015cv05345
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 64 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.
June 29, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Dismiss.The court grants in part and denies in part the Design Learned defendants' motion to dismiss. The court grants the motion to dismiss Mr. Yu's FDCPA claim with prejudice. The court denies the motion to dismiss the contract claim (to the extent alleged against Design Learned), the promissory estoppel claim, and the FAL and UCL claims, except to the extent alleged against Ms. Block. The claims asserted against Ms. Block in her individual capacity are dismissed without prejudice. Mr. Yu may amend the claims against her within 21 days of this order. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
April 21, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler. The court grants the motion to set aside default entered against Design Learned, Inc. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
March 28, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Case Management Statement at ECF No. 30 and explaining case-management procedures. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/28/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
February 19, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE-MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/19/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yu v. Design Learned, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Learned, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.C.C. & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Learned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly August
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pfarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?