Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. U.S. Catering Truck Manufacturing, LCC et al

Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: U.S. Catering Truck Manufacturing, LCC and Luis Soto
Case Number: 3:2015cv05379
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
July 20, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER AND CASE DEALINES - Fact discovery cutoff: 1/20/2017. Dispositive motions to be heard by 3/29/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2017 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 6/19/2017 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
February 24, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/24/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. U.S. Catering Truck Manufacturing, LCC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Anderson
Represented By: Tamiko Alicia Malia Dunham
Represented By: Thomas Edward Mulvihill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Catering Truck Manufacturing, LCC
Represented By: Alison F. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Soto
Represented By: Alison F. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?