Floyd v. Asbestos Corporation, LTD, et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Floyd
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., Autozone West, Inc., Buffalo Pumps, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Douglass Insulation Company, Inc., Flowservi Corporation, FMC Corporation, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, ITT Corporation, Mechanical Drives & Belting, Metalclad Insulation LLC, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Nibco Inc., O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The and Trane US, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05382
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jerry Floyd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 188 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Action As to Defendant CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jerry Floyd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 179 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. filed by BW/IP, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 177 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing action as to Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC filed by Metalclad Insulation LLC, 168 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing action as to Defendant CertainTeed Corporation filed by Certainteed Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Incorrectly sued as Foster Wheeler USA Corporation). Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF CRANE CO filed by Jerry Floyd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal and Proposed Order filed by M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 124 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. Asbestos Corporation, LTD, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Michele Cherie Barnes
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglass Insulation Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowservi Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Rebecca Suh
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Burnam Ebrahimi
Represented By: Sandra Lucia Gryder
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Previn Ariaraj Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Taylor Carl Day
Represented By: Joseph Duffy, Esq.
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mechanical Drives & Belting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nibco Inc.
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Gregory Scott Rosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Renee Christine Kelley
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Lanphear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Rebecca Suh
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Floyd
Represented By: Cassiana Aaronson
Represented By: Stephen Michael Fishback
Represented By: John Bruce Jackson
Represented By: Daniel Lee Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?