Hart v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Hart
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Catholic Healthcare West Long Term Disability Plan and Catholic Healthcare West Pension Plan
Case Number: 3:2015cv05392
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 80 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, FORM OF JUDGMENT, AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
August 23, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 94 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
July 17, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff Hart's 81 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time on Hart's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/17/2017. (tehlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 20, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 76 Administrative Motion to Vacate 75 the Court's June 14, 2017 Order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/20/17. (tehlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 14, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Plaintiff's 67 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs of Suit, Award of Damages and Pre-judgment Interest. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/14/17. The Parties' 74 Stipulation is found moot.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 24, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Judgment and Denying Defendant's 57 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/24/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
February 13, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Denying 47 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: Fourteenth Affirmative Defense. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/13/17. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Healthcare West Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Healthcare West Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hart
Represented By: Emily A. Bolt
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Represented By: Brian Henry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?