Robinson v. The Chefs' Warehouse
Plaintiff: Shaon Robinson
Defendant: The Chefs' Warehouse
Case Number: 3:2015cv05421
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/23/2020 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2020.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/2/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/10/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 243 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant must produce certain discovery within 7 days of this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 202 regarding Certification Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/25/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING 148 MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc. Motions terminated: 148 MOTION for Protective Order filed by The Chefs' Warehouse, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/26/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 147 Ex Parte Application re 148 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Non-Party Individual and Stay Subpoena Pending Disposition. Briefing scheduled re Defendants' 148 Motion for Protective Order is continued: Plaintiffs' opposition is due by 12/15/2017. Defendants' reply is due by 12/22/2017; ORDER discharging 150 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/11/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017) Modified on 12/11/2017 (kawlc1, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to both parties regarding Discovery 147 , 148 , 149 . Joint Show Cause Response due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/28/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 139 , 140 10/23/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding parties' 130 9/26/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 117 8/11/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Regarding 111 Discovery Letter Brief re: Requests for Production of Documents. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Defendant's 85 Motion for Reconsideration of Defendant's motion for sanctions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER requiring Michele Beilke to file a supplemental declaration re 85 MOTION for Reconsideration within 5 days. Michael Hoffman is permitted to respond via supplemental declaration within 2 days. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/2/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 59 Motion for Sanctions; ORDER referring Michael Hoffman to the Standing Committee on Professional Conduct. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 58 Discovery Letter Brief re: Requests for Production. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 49 Motion for Administrative Relief. Defendant is directed to file a formal motion for sanctions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 43 1/3/17 Discovery Letter Brief and Denying Plaintiff's request to file a motion to compel. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING 37 11/15/16 Order grantig Administrative Motion file a unilateral discovery letter brief ; ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/17/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 33 Administrative Motion file a unilateral discovery letter brief ; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Defendant to explain why sanctions should not be imposed for its failure to participate in the submission of a joint discovery letter. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 21 leave to amend and referring discovery dispute. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 28 discovery motion, without prejudice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/24/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. The Chefs' Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaon Robinson
Represented By: Leonard Thomas Emma
Represented By: Michael Robert Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen Noel Ilg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chefs' Warehouse
Represented By: Michele Jane Beilke
Represented By: Ian Andrew Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?