Monsanto v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage

Plaintiff: Roger Monsanto
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2015cv05424
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
January 21, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Other Case Hearings and Deadlines; AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Joint Status Report due 4/15/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/21/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
December 4, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/4/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monsanto v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Monsanto
Represented By: Chaka H Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?