Csoka v. Varian et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Csoka
Defendant: John W Varian, Paul D. Rubin, Patrick J. Scannon, William K. Bowes, Jr, Peter Barton Hutt, Joseph M. Limber, W. Denman Van Ness, Timothy P Wilbert, Jack L. Wyszomierski and Xoma Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv05429
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Joseph M. Limber, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, William K. Bowes, Jr, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Timothy P. Wilbert, Jack L. Wyszomierski, John W. Varian. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 10, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Joseph M. Limber, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, William K. Bowes, Jr, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Timothy P. Wilbert, Jack L. Wyszomierski, John W. Varian. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
May 5, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Joseph M. Limber, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, William K. Bowes, Jr, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Timothy P. Wilbert, Jack L. Wyszomierski, John W. Varian. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 19, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING THE ACTION re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying the Action filed by Joseph M. Limber, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, William K. Bowes, Jr, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Timothy P. Wilbert, Jack L. Wyszomierski, John W. Varian. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
February 17, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 9 MOTION to Continue. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/17/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Csoka v. Varian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Csoka
Represented By: Adam Richard Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Scannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K. Bowes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Barton Hutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Limber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Denman Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P Wilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack L. Wyszomierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xoma Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?